Potter v. GreenSky, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Potter and Stephanie Salizar
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and GreenSky, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00581
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #14 Waiver of Service Executed (mgr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney K. Ann Broussard. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -MISSING NAME OF PARTY WAIVING SERVICE OF SUMMONS***WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephanie Potter as to GreenSky, LLC. Waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona) Modified on 7/16/2019 (mgr).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Elizabeth Scofield. (mgr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, Rebecca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Rebecca Wernicke Anthony added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, Rebecca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Forrest Mathew Seger, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Forrest Mathew Seger, III added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Seger, Forrest)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Potter. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephanie Potter as to Trans Union, LLC. Waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine McFarland Stein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Katherine McFarland Stein added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Stein, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Misty L. Peterson. (mgr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephanie Potter as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Ladwig, Ramona)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
May 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
May 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stephanie Potter. (Ladwig, Ramona)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12170217), filed by Stephanie Potter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ladwig, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter v. GreenSky, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Potter
Represented By: Ramona Veronica Ladwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Salizar
Represented By: Ramona Veronica Ladwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Wernicke Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Merar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Represented By: Katherine McFarland Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenSky, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?