W.L.,IV v. Scott Zirus, et.al.
Plaintiff: W.L., IV
Defendant: SCOTT ZIRUS, Camp Stewart For Boys Inc., American Institute for Foreign Study Inc. and Scott Ash James Zirus
Case Number: 5:2019cv00607
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Scott Ash James Zirus, Pro-Se.(wg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Jeff H. Ray added to party American Institute for Foreign Study Inc.(pty:dft) by American Institute for Foreign Study Inc..(Ray, Jeff)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after anydefendant has appeared., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Willie Ben Daw, III added to party Camp Stewart For Boys Inc.(pty:dft) by Camp Stewart For Boys Inc..(Daw, Willie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W.L., IV. American Institute for Foreign Study Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Sawicki, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W.L., IV. Camp Stewart For Boys Inc. served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Sawicki, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter (Andrew A. Jones) as to W.L., IV. (wg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Institute for Foreign Study Inc., CAMP STEWART FOR BOYS INC., Scott Ash James Zirus. (wg)
June 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by W. L. #4. (Sawicki, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12190819). No Summons requested at this time, filed by W. L. #4. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sawicki, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.L.,IV v. Scott Zirus, et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT ZIRUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Stewart For Boys Inc.
Represented By: Willie Ben Daw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study Inc.
Represented By: Jeff H. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ash James Zirus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.L., IV
Represented By: Michael Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?