Tautenhahn v. Tautenhahn Valle, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Tautenhahn
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc., Tautenhahn Vallie, LLC and Tautenhahn Valle, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00641
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Daniel Tautenhahn. Scott Tautenhahn (Cordell, Brent)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #12 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amded Complaint by Daniel Tautenhahn. (Cordell, Brent)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Antone L. Peterson. (mgr) Modified on 8/6/2019, to edit text (mgr).
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: MISSING PROPOSED ORDER. Please do not file the entire document, please only file the ProposedOrder using the Attachment Event and link to the Motion re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amded Complaint (mgr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Daniel Tautenhahn.(Cordell, Brent)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amded Complaint by Daniel Tautenhahn. (Cordell, Brent) Modified on 8/5/2019 (mgr).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for M. Jake McClellan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Troy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Troy Ray Ford for M. Jake McClellan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12379669) by on behalf of Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to M. Jake McClellan Pro Hac)(Ford, Troy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 10/11/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019, Discovery due by 3/27/2020, Motions due by 4/30/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500050101. (mgr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Recommendations by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(Ford, Troy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice from Brent Michael Cordell to represent Daniel Tautenhahn. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(mgr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Polaris Industries Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Polaris Industries, Inc..(Beck, David)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Brent M. Cordell. (mgr)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, JS 44 by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Troy)
June 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12211070), filed by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tautenhahn v. Tautenhahn Valle, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Troy Ray Ford
Represented By: David J. Beck
Represented By: M. Jake McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tautenhahn Vallie, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tautenhahn Valle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tautenhahn
Represented By: Brent M. Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?