Carmicheal v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Petitioner: Terrence Carmicheal
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 5:2019cv00665
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 2:19-cv-00123.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, SAN ANTONIO DIVISION: Case transferred to San Antonio Division of Western District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/13/2019) (nhp)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page also mailed to petitioner) Wed Jun 12 11:04:42 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum of Law filed by Terrence Carmicheal (vls) Modified filer on 6/12/2019 (vls). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Terrence Carmichael (vls) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrence Carmichael. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (vls) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (vls) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmicheal v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrence Carmicheal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?