Singer et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: Shameika Dixon, Paul Singer, Carla Watson, Gladys Sifuentes and John O'Connell
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00679
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. McNitzky of Catherine N. Grech ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12419439) by on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNitzky, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. McNitzky of Martin D. Bern ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12417355) by on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNitzky, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. McNitzky of Marja-Liisa Overbeck ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12417278) by on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNitzky, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (McNitzky, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..(McNitzky, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Paul Singer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Gladys Sifuentes)(Alexander, William)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. answer due 7/24/2019. (aej)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer or responsive pleading due July 24, 2019. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNitzky, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Singer. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Alexander, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Shameika Dixon, Paul Singer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Carla Watson)(Alexander, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Paul Singer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of John O'Connell, #2 Exhibit Consent Of Carla Watson)(Alexander, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (aej)
June 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Shameika Dixon, Paul Singer. (Alexander, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12230827), filed by Paul Singer, Shameika Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Paul Singer, #2 Exhibit Consent of Shameika Dixon, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Martin D. Bern
Represented By: Catherine N. Grech
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Mark A. McNitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameika Dixon
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Singer
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Watson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Sifuentes
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O'Connell
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?