Cundiff v. Stevens Tanker Division, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Cundiff, Jessica Villareal, Frazier N. James, III and Cathy Black
Defendant: Stevens Tanker Division, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00683
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Jessica Villarreal by Charles Cundiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welmaker, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Consent by Cathy Black, Charles Cundiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welmaker, Douglas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent of Cathy Black by Charles Cundiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welmaker, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***THE WRONG SUMMONS WAS ORIGINALLY ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS ENTRY. THE DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REPLACED WITH THE CORRECT SUMMONS.*** re #4 Summons Issued. (bc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stevens Tanker Division, LLC. (bc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/14/2019) (bc).
June 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Charles Cundiff. (Welmaker, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Charles Cundiff. (Welmaker, Douglas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12231754), filed by Charles Cundiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welmaker, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cundiff v. Stevens Tanker Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Tanker Division, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cundiff
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Villareal
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frazier N. James, III
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Black
Represented By: Douglas B. Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?