Ledet v. Perry Homes

Plaintiff: Candella Ledet
Defendant: Perry Homes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00712
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Remark: Ms. Ledet called today (8/15/2019) regarding the status of her case. I told her that the court had granted her IFP and was ordered to show cause (docket entry #4). She stated that she has not received the order. Today (8/15/2019) I emailed Docket Entries #3, #4, #5, #6 to Ms. Ledet. (dtg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Candella Ledet (mgr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT, filed by Candella Ledet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgr)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Candella Ledet.( Show Cause Response due by 8/22/2019,), GRANTING #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Candella Ledet.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
August 1, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad.. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (rf)
June 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Candella Ledet. (bc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Candella Ledet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bc)
June 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
June 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledet v. Perry Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candella Ledet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?