Ayala v. Collier
Petitioner: Bryan Ayala
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00716
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND BRIEF to #7 Response to Habeas Petition by Bryan Ayala. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(mgr)
August 5, 2019 State Court Records received (3) Boxes placed in filing area. (mgr) Modified on 8/7/2019, to edit text (mgr).
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 01 COVER PAGE, #2 02 DOCKET SHEET, #3 03 OPINION, #4 04 RR VOL. 1, #5 05 RR VOL. 2, #6 06 RR VOL. 3, #7 07 RR VOL. 4, #8 08 RR VOL. 5, #9 09 RR VOL. 6, #10 10 RR VOL. 7_Part1, #11 11 RR VOL. 7_Part2, #12 12 RR VOL. 8, #13 13 RR VOL. 9, #14 14 CLERKS RECORD, #15 15 APP BRIEF, #16 16 STATE BRIEF, #17 17 ORIGINAL PDR_Part1, #18 18 ORIGINAL PDR_Part2, #19 19 PDR RECEIVED_Part1, #20 20 PDR RECEIVED_Part2, #21 21 WR-88,630-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 7-18-2018, #22 22 WR-88,630-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 6-28-2018, #23 23 WR-88,630-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 10-17-2018, #24 24 WR-88,630-02 ADDRESS VERIFICATION-CO 10-10-2018, #25 25 WR-88,630-02 MOT FOR RECON DISP WRIT 11-6-2018, #26 26 WR-88,630-02 MOT FOR RECON RECD APPLNT 10-31-2018, #27 27 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part1, #28 28 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part2, #29 29 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part3, #30 30 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part4, #31 31 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part5, #32 32 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part6, #33 33 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part7, #34 34 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part8, #35 35 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part9, #36 36 WR-88,630-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-10-18_Part10, #37 37 WR-88,630-03 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 3-13-2019, #38 38 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part1, #39 39 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part2, #40 40 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part3, #41 41 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part4, #42 42 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part5, #43 43 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part6, #44 44 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part7, #45 45 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part8, #46 46 WR-88,630-03 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 02-27-2019_Part9)(Lancaster, Benjamin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis.(Lancaster, Benjamin)
July 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 8/28/2019. (mgr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to Answer (Docket Entry 6) entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Respondent's deadline to Answer Petitioner's Petition (Docket Entry 1) is EXTENDED to AUGUST 28, 2019. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (wb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief in Support by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Lancaster, Benjamin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lorie Davis. (Lancaster, Benjamin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Graham Lancaster on behalf of Lorie Davis. Attorney Benjamin Graham Lancaster added to party Lorie Davis(pty:res) (Lancaster, Benjamin)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Advisory to the Clerk of Court)(mgr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500049724 (mgr)
June 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
June 19, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (mgr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bryan Ayala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 cover letter, #4 envelope)(mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala v. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Benjamin Graham Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Ayala
Represented By: Gary Churak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?