Nehme v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Maria Nehme
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00730
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Assignment of Magistrate Judge. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Liu, Emily)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 8/5/2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Wendy Lynn Furman for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liu, Emily)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily K. Liu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12354939) by on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Liu, Emily)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily K. Liu on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Attorney Emily K. Liu added to party The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Liu, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (aej)
June 21, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Maria Nehme. (Vessel, J.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maria Nehme. (Vessel, J.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12263269), filed by Maria Nehme. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessel, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehme v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Nehme
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Represented By: Marc S. Whitehead
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily K. Liu
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?