Hilton v. Prause et al
Plaintiff: Donald L. Hilton, Jr
Defendant: Liberos, LLC and Nicole Prause
Case Number: 5:2019cv00755
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute (aej)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Parsons, Claire) Modified on 8/23/2019 (aej).
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause, re #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Defendant Liberos, LLC, Defendant Nicole Prause (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. Signed by Jason K. Pulliam. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald L. Hilton, Jr, re #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Defendant Liberos, LLC, Defendant Nicole Prause (Packard, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald L. Hilton, Jr, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defamation Per Se filed by Defendant Liberos, LLC, Defendant Nicole Prause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Packard, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause filed by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(aej)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defamation Per Se by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Parsons, Claire)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Packard, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters. (aej)
June 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicole Prause (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12282212), filed by Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplement to JS 44, #4 Personal Data Sheet Parties of the Case)(Parsons, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilton v. Prause et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberos, LLC
Represented By: Claire Winniford Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Prause
Represented By: Claire Winniford Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Hilton, Jr
Represented By: Daniel W. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?