Bexar Diversified MF-1 LLC v. General Star Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Bexar Diversified MF-1, LLC
Defendant: General Star Indemnity Company and Paul R. White and Company Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00773
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. It is ordered that this lawsuit is abated until October 8, 2019 to permit Defendants to re-inspect the properties and allow the parties to explore resolution of the dispute. Defendants' deadline for responding to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is extended until October 18, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdxr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Stay Case and Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by General Star Indemnity Company, Paul R. White and Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cummings, Kristin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #5 Deficiency Notice,, by General Star Indemnity Company. (Cummings, Kristin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Kristin Cummings - Proposed order required with motion. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the "Attachment" event located under "Other Documents" from menu and link the proposed order to thisdocument. See page 11, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western of District of Texas. re #3 MOTION to Stay Case Verified Plea in Abatement (rg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bexar Diversified MF-1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Concerning Documents in Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rodgers, Clare)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #5. MOTION to Stay Case Verified Plea in Abatement by General Star Indemnity Company. (Cummings, Kristin) Modified on 7/31/2019 (rg).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ADVISORY (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/9/2019) the parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 2, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 2, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***REMOVED FILER: PAUL R. WHITE AND COMPANY INC. FROM THE LIST OF FILERS*** re #1 Notice of Removal. (bc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12304613), filed by GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Citation, P's Pet. & Ds' Ans., #3 Exhibit C - Rule 7.1 Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement)(Cummings, Kristin) Modified on 7/2/2019 To remove filer: Paul R. White and Company (bc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bexar Diversified MF-1 LLC v. General Star Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Star Indemnity Company
Represented By: Lindsey Pratt Bruning
Represented By: Kristin C. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. White and Company Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Pratt Bruning
Represented By: Kristin C. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bexar Diversified MF-1, LLC
Represented By: Clare Pace Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?