M2 Federal Inc. v. Solis Constructors, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: M2 Federal Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Solis Constructors, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00783
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M2 Federal Inc.. Solis Constructors, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Bryant, Nohl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Dry, Ryan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by M2 Federal Inc.. (Bryant, Nohl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Solis Constructors, Inc. (rg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by M2 Federal Inc.. (Bryant, Nohl)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven K. Cannon on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Attorney Steven K. Cannon added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America(pty:dft) (Cannon, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Ryan D. Dry added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America(pty:dft) by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Dry, Ryan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M2 Federal Inc.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Bryant, Nohl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (rg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Solis Constructors, Inc. (rg)
July 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M2 Federal Inc.. (Bryant, Nohl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by M2 Federal Inc.. All Defendants (Bryant, Nohl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12315579), filed by M2 Federal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryant, Nohl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M2 Federal Inc. v. Solis Constructors, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M2 Federal Inc.
Represented By: Nohl Patrick Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Ryan D. Dry
Represented By: Steven K. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solis Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?