Walzem LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance
Plaintiff: Walzem LLC
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00791
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 10/30/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019, Discovery due by 4/24/2020, Motions due by 5/29/2020,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Eggleston, William)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit proposed scheduling order due to the Court within s30 days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Cincinnati Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William J. Eggleston added to party Cincinnati Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Eggleston, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walzem LLC. Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Fowler, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Company. (mgr)
July 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Walzem LLC. (Fowler, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12318755). No Summons requested at this time, filed by walzem LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fowler, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walzem LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: William J. Eggleston
Represented By: William J. Eggleston, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walzem LLC
Represented By: James Ryan Fowler
Represented By: Rene M. Sigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?