DeWitt v. H-E-B, LP
Plaintiff: Juan A. DeWitt
Defendant: H-E-B, LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00799
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss by H-E-B, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Lawrence)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan A. DeWitt. H-E-B, LP served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (aej)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to H-E-B, LP. (dtg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 500049912), filed by Juan A. DeWitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
July 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg)
July 10, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeWitt v. H-E-B, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A. DeWitt
Represented By: Arthur G. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-E-B, LP
Represented By: Lawrence D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?