Conrad v. Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Conrad
Defendant: Jill Oxford, Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc and David Brambila
Case Number: 5:2019cv00810
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for pretrial proceedings including any requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MFAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party David Brambila(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Jill Oxford(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc(pty:dft) by David Brambila, Jill Oxford, Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc.(Rapp, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. Jill Oxford served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. David Brambila served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jill Oxford. (aej)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David Brambila. (aej)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc. (aej)
July 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NICOLE CONRAD. (Cowan, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12337220), filed by NICOLE CONRAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Oxford
Represented By: Robert A. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brambila
Represented By: Robert A. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Conrad
Represented By: Robert Wayne Cowan
Represented By: Katie R. McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?