Bailey v. Spiros Partners, LTD

Plaintiff: Jennifer Bailey
Defendant: Spiros Partners, LTD
Case Number: 5:2019cv00866
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING PHASE I SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rf)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rf)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Casey T. Wallace added to party Spiros Partners, LTD(pty:dft) by Spiros Partners, LTD.(Wallace, Casey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Bailey. Spiros Partners, LTD served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Forester, Jesse)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregg C. Greenberg for Jennifer Bailey. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Hamilton Forester (Gregg Greenberg) by on behalf of Jennifer Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Forester, Jesse)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Incorrect case number or case style listed on document filed. re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Hamilton Forester (Gregg Greenberg) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12389773) (mgr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Hamilton Forester (Gregg Greenberg) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12389773) by on behalf of Jennifer Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Forester, Jesse) Modified on 7/25/2019 (mgr).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to attorney Gregg C. Greenberg regarding admission into the Western District of Texas. (bc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Spiros Partners, LTD. (bc)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jennifer Bailey. (Forester, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Jennifer Bailey. (Forester, Jesse)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12371405), filed by Jennifer Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Jennifer Bailey Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ricks SA Civil Cover Sheet)(Forester, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Spiros Partners, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bailey
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Represented By: Gregg C. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiros Partners, LTD
Represented By: Casey T. Wallace
Represented By: Benjamin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?