US Melon LLC v. Avila Produce Inc. et al
Plaintiff: US Melon LLC
Defendant: Ronald William Carlett, Avila Produce Inc., Greta Teresa Santos, Jesus Arturo Avila and Ronald William Catlett
Case Number: 5:2019cv00880
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions Motion to Dissolve TRO, MOTION to Vacate August 7, 2019 Hearing by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Ronald William Catlett served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Jesus Arturo Avila served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Avila Produce Inc. served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Temporary Restraining Order upon Defendants by US Melon LLC re 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Personal Service, #2 Exhibit B - Service via Facsimile)(Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Greta Teresa Santos. (aej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ronald William Carlett. (aej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jesus Arturo Avila. (aej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Avila Produce Inc.. (aej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by US Melon LLC. to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons to J. Avila, #2 Summons to R. Carlett, #3 Summons to G. Santos)(Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by US Melon LLC. (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) by US Melon LLC re #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support, filed by US Melon LLC, re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff US Melon LLC, #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff US Melon LLC (Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ***VACATED PER COURT ORDER #18*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) Modified on 8/5/2019 (aej).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Representative, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion for Order to Show Cause)(Stokes, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12387169), filed by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Avila Produce, #4 Summons to Jesus Avila, #5 Summons to Ronald Carlett, #6 Summons to Greta Santos)(Stokes, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Melon LLC v. Avila Produce Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald William Carlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avila Produce Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greta Teresa Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Arturo Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald William Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Melon LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?