Hernandez v. Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Valerie Hernandez
Defendant: Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00887
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SUBMISSION OF AGREED ORDER OF REMAND re #8 Advisory to the Court filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. The parties shall submit their Agreed Order of Remand on or before Friday, September 27, 2019.Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Stephens, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Stephens, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Scheduling Recommendations by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Holloway, Carrie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Stephens, David)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (John Papapavlou) on behalf of Valerie Hernandez. (wg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (Porya Mostaghimi) on behalf of Valerie Hernandez. (wg)
July 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12394664), filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Stephens, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Hernandez
Represented By: John Papapavlou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David R. Stephens
Represented By: Carrie D. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?