Vargas v. L.L.C., Inc. d/b/a Perfect 10 Men's Club et al
Plaintiff: Candice Desrosiers and Alexys Vargas
Counter Plaintiff: L.L.C., Inc., Glenn Williams, William Cox and Teresa Thompson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00910
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees by William Cox, L.L.C., Inc., Teresa Thompson, Glenn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit in Support, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Bishop, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims without Prejudice and Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims for Mootness by William Cox, L.L.C., Inc., Teresa Thompson, Glenn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Bishop, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Alexys Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Chitale, Ved)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #19 MOTION to Continue and to Reschedule 10/25/19 Initial Pretrial Conference filed by William Cox, Glenn Williams, Teresa Thompson, L.L.C., Inc. ( Pretrial Conference reset for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Filed Consent by Candice Desrosiers (Assaad, Gabriel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Cox, L.L.C., Inc., Teresa Thompson, Glenn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Bishop, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue and to Reschedule 10/25/19 Initial Pretrial Conference by William Cox, L.L.C., Inc., Teresa Thompson, Glenn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Bishop, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel A. Assaad on Behalf of Ved Chitale ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12531204) by on behalf of Alexys Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/21/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney for pretrial proceedings including any requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM against Alexys Vargas, filed by Teresa Thompson, William Cox, Glenn Williams, L.L.C., Inc..(Bishop, Brian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexys Vargas, Candice Desrosiers. Teresa Thompson served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wayne Hodges on behalf of Candice Desrosiers, Alexys Vargas. Attorney David Wayne Hodges added to party Candice Desrosiers(pty:pla), Attorney David Wayne Hodges added to party Alexys Vargas(pty:pla) (Hodges, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexys Vargas, Candice Desrosiers. Glenn Williams served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexys Vargas, Candice Desrosiers. William Cox served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexys Vargas, Candice Desrosiers. L.L.C., Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Assaad, Gabriel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Teresa Thompson. (aej)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Cox. (aej)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Glenn Williams. (aej)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to L.L.C., Inc. (aej)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Consent by Alexys Vargas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Assaad, Gabriel)
July 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alexys Vargas. (Assaad, Gabriel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12412398), filed by Alexys Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Assaad, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. L.L.C., Inc. d/b/a Perfect 10 Men's Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Desrosiers
Represented By: Gabriel A. Assaad
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Represented By: Ved Chitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexys Vargas
Represented By: Gabriel A. Assaad
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Represented By: Ved Chitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: L.L.C., Inc.
Represented By: Brian Walter Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Glenn Williams
Represented By: Brian Walter Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: William Cox
Represented By: Brian Walter Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Teresa Thompson
Represented By: Brian Walter Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?