U-Haul Co. of Arizona v. Hibbard et al
Plaintiff: U-Haul Co. of Arizona
Defendant: GEICO Government Employees Insurance Co., Marwan Mohammed Cashou, Susan Webb, N.G., Rose Victoria Saunders, Deborah Hibbard, Allstate Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co., Ean Holdings LLC, Chandale Leshea Washington, Genesis Garcia and Jonathan Jacob Garcia
Case Number: 5:2019cv00987
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Chandale Leshea Washington's ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader. Attorney Donald Lee Crook, Jr added to party Chandale Leshea Washington(pty:dft) by Chandale Leshea Washington.(Crook, Donald)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by GEICO Government Employees Insurance Co..(wg)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Original Answer to Plaintiff Complaint in Interpleader. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant GEICO (Government Employees Insurance Company)s Original Answer toPlaintiffs Complaint in Interpleader should be filed by the U.S. Clerks Office entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Rose Victoria Saunders ANSWER to Complaint U-Haul Co. of Arizona. Attorney Kelly W. Kelly added to party Rose Victoria Saunders(pty:dft) by Rose Victoria Saunders.(Kelly, Kelly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Original Answer to Plaintiff Complaint in Interplealder by GEICO Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer, #2 Proposed Order on MFL to File Answer)(Jones, Scott)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Answer by Defendants Jonathan Garcia, Genesis Garcia, N.G., Minor and Marwan Qashou ANSWER to #1 Complaint, in Interpleader by Marwan Mohammed Cashou.(Wilson, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Marwan Mohammed Cashou, Ean Holdings LLC, GEICO Government Employees Insurance Co., Genesis Garcia, Jonathan Jacob Garcia, Deborah Hibbard, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co., Rose Victoria Saunders, Chandale Leshea Washington, Susan Webb. (wg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Hendrickson, Bradford)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Hendrickson, Bradford)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Deposit Monies into the Clerk's Registry Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
August 16, 2019 Remark: **PARTIES BE SURE TO PUT THE JUDGE'S INITIALS ON ALL YOUR FILED PLEADINGS** (wg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, Bradford)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sanford Hooper. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles M. Stam. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradford James Hendrickson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12482726) by on behalf of U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, Bradford)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradford James Hendrickson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12482684) by on behalf of U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, Bradford)
August 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12477402). No Summons requested at this time, filed by U-Haul of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hendrickson, Bradford) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (wg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U-Haul Co. of Arizona v. Hibbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Scott Paul Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marwan Mohammed Cashou
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.G.
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Victoria Saunders
Represented By: Kelly W. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ean Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandale Leshea Washington
Represented By: Donald Lee Crook, Jr.
Represented By: Guy J. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Garcia
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Jacob Garcia
Represented By: Robert Paul Wilson
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U-Haul Co. of Arizona
Represented By: Bradford James Hendrickson
Represented By: Sanford G. Hooper
Represented By: Charles M. Stam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?