Marvin Montgomery, et al v. H.E. Butt Grocery Company, et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Montgomery and Francisco Meza
Defendant: H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company and John and Jane Does 1-20
Case Number: 5:2019cv01063
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Deborah S. Davidson for H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee,Deborah S. Davidson for H.E. Butt Grocery Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Sharbaugh for H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee,Matthew J. Sharbaugh for H.E. Butt Grocery Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld for H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee,Jeremy P. Blumenfeld for H.E. Butt Grocery Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derick J. Rodgers for Matthew J. Sharbaugh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12710423) by on behalf of H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Derick)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derick J. Rodgers for Deborah S. Davidson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12710381) by on behalf of H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Derick)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derick J. Rodgers for Jeremy P. Blumenfeld ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12710311) by on behalf of H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Derick)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Substitute Attorneys Jeremy Blumenfeld, Deborah S Davidson, and Matthew J. Sharbaugh and Extend time to Answer. Answer Due 11/11/2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cedillo, Ricardo)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee answer due 10/28/2019; H.E. Butt Grocery Company answer due 10/28/2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Cedillo, Ricardo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Ricardo Cedillo Proposed order required with motion. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the "Attachment" event located under "Other Documents" from menu and link the proposed order to thisdocument. See page 11, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western of District of Texas. re #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (rg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - See Deficiency Notice #16. Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee, H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (Cedillo, Ricardo) Modified on 9/10/2019 (rg).
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marvin Montgomery, Francisco Meza. H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019; H.E. Butt Grocery Company served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Kendall, Joe)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kai H. Richter for Francisco Meza,Kai H. Richter for Marvin Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carl Engstrom for Francisco Meza,Carl Engstrom for Marvin Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brock Specht for Francisco Meza,Brock Specht for Marvin Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandon T. McDonough for Francisco Meza,Brandon T. McDonough for Marvin Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Carl F. Engstrom ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12574292) by on behalf of Francisco Meza, Marvin Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Brock Specht ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12574270) by on behalf of Francisco Meza, Marvin Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Brandon T. McDonough ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12574256) by on behalf of Francisco Meza, Marvin Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joe Kendall on Behalf of Kai Richter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12574072) by on behalf of Francisco Meza, Marvin Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Joe)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee. (rg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (rg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H.E. Butt Grocery Company. (rg)
September 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francisco Meza, Marvin Montgomery. (Kendall, Joe)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12555387), filed by Marvin Montgomery, Francisco Meza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kendall, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Montgomery, et al v. H.E. Butt Grocery Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Montgomery
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Meza
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-E-B Savings & Retirement Plan Investment & Administration Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E. Butt Grocery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?