Juarez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Pedro Juarez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01081
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/10/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2019, Discovery due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 8/7/2020,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Recommendations Agreed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Thomason, Joel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Thomason, Joel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations.the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R.Civ. P 26(f) to submit (1) a proposed scheduling order and (2) a Rule 26(f) Report in the formatsshown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by October 11, 2019. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Damian R. Saenz. (mgr)
September 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
September 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Thomason, Joel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12580776), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomason, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joel R. Thomason
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Juarez
Represented By: Damian R. Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?