Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Monica Lopez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01088
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Lopez. Andrew Saul served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Monica Lopez. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wg)
September 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Monica Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wg)
September 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Monica Lopez,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint [#1-1] shall be filed by the Clerk without prepayment of fees. It is also ORDERED that the District Clerk docket the proposed summonses and issue the summonses as requested by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Monica Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney.. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Lopez
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?