Cramer v. By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Cramer
Defendant: Carlos Ordonez and By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01090
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
October 21, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO ADD THE JOINT FILERS ( By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC and Carlos Ordonez)*** re #9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan. (bc)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Debra Cramer, By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, and Carlos Ordonez. (Galo, Michael) Modified on 10/21/2019 To add joint filers (bc).
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines- Motions due by 3/20/2020 (bc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/13/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2019 and Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 3, 2019 Notice of Correction: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN ADDED AS FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT*** re #7 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. (rf)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Scheduling Recommendations by Debra Cramer, Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez. (Galo, Michael) Modified on 10/3/2019 , to add filers (rf).
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez. (Sanchez, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Debra Cramer. (Galo, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court by 10/15/2019. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez. (Sanchez, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez. (Sanchez, Mark)
September 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12588748), filed by By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC, Carlos Ordonez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sanchez, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramer v. By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ordonez
Represented By: Mark Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: By Grace Floors & Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mark Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Cramer
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?