Vara v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Vara
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01097
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Mediation Completed by 9/25/2020,, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/2/2019,, Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2019,, Discovery due by 6/1/2020,, Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019,, Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020,, Bench Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia,, Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia,). Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt) Modified TEXT on 10/28/2019 (wg).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter as to (Damian R. Saenz) on behalf of Ronald Vara. (wg)
September 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12593025), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manning, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vara v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Vara
Represented By: Damian R. Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?