Robinson v. U.S. Air Force et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Robinson
Defendant: Department of Labor (Dallas, TX), Randolph AFB (San Antonio, TX), Department of Labor (Washington, DC) E.C.A.B., O.P.M. (Washington, DC), U.S. Air Force and Tinker AFB (Okla, OK)
Case Number: 5:2019cv01107
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Bobby Joe Robinson. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file his More Definite Statement aspreviously ordered on or before November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 PRO-SE MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Bobby Joe Robinson.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 PRO-SE COMPLAINT, filed by Bobby Joe Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wg)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Joe Robinson,The Clerk shall file Plaintiff's Complaint without prepayment of fees, and will Order Plaintiff to file a more definite statement within (21) Days from the day of this Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter by Bobby Joe Robinson. (dtg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Joe Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
September 12, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. U.S. Air Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor (Dallas, TX)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph AFB (San Antonio, TX)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor (Washington, DC) E.C.A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.P.M. (Washington, DC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinker AFB (Okla, OK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?