Allred v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Justin Allred
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01108
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Daniel Cabrera on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney Marc Daniel Cabrera added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Cabrera, Marc)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Jennifer Kinney Parnell as counsel of record for Defendant. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Kinney, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Notice of Correction: Hearing Reset before Mag. Judge Farrer re Set/Reset Hearings. (wg)
September 25, 2019 Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer, (wg)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MATTERS AND PENDING MOTIONS, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2019,, Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) Modified hearing on 9/30/2019 (wg).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert T. Mowrey on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mowrey, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr. (wg)
September 12, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
September 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12600558), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McDougal, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allred v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Allred
Represented By: Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew L. McDougal
Represented By: Jennifer Lynette Kinney
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?