United States of America (IRS) v. Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Defendant: Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc., Michael S. Batey, Joseph F. Schreiber, III, Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA, Debra J. Schreiber and Lisa K. Batey
Case Number: 5:2019cv01110
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default against PrecisionCraft Cabinets, Inc., Joseph F. Schreiber, III, Debra J. Schreiber, Michael S. Batey and Lisa K. Batey by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Herrin, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (bc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint . Attorney Patrick H. Autry added to party Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA(pty:dft) by Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA.(Autry, Patrick)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by United States of America (IRS).(Herrin, Thomas) Modified on 10/4/2019 (rg).
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Lisa K. Batey served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Michael S. Batey served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Debra J. Schreiber served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Joseph F. Schreiber, III served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by United States of America (IRS). (Herrin, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (IRS). Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lisa K. Batey. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael S. Batey. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Debra J. Schreiber. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joseph F. Schreiber, III. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc. (aej)
September 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
September 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement)(Herrin, Thomas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (IRS) v. Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Craft Cabinets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Batey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Schreiber, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Farm Credit Services of America, FLCA
Represented By: Patrick H. Autry
Represented By: Joseph M. Davis
Represented By: Clinton Lee Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra J. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa K. Batey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Represented By: Thomas M. Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?