Maira Montelongo v. Red Beard LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Maira Montelongo
Defendant: Truong Elliot, Red Beard LLC, Matta Nicholas, Matta Jeremy, Elliot Truong, Jeremy Matta, John/Jane Does 1-5 and Nicholas Matta
Case Number: 5:2019cv01123
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on or before November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 15 day extension by Maira Montelongo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McRae, Leland)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against John/Jane Does 1-5, Jeremy Matta, Nicholas Matta, Red Beard LLC, Elliot Truong amending #1 Complaint, filed by Maira Montelongo.(rg)
October 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elliot Truong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrazek, Mary)
October 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Red Beard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Pietrazek, Mary)
October 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nicholas Matta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Pietrazek, Mary)
October 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jeremy Matta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrazek, Mary)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Elliot Truong. (rg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Matta. (rg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nicholas Matta. (rg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Red Beard LLC. (rg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Maira Montelongo. all defendants (McRae, Leland)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12613575), filed by Maira Montelongo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McRae, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maira Montelongo v. Red Beard LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truong Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Beard LLC
Represented By: Mary Carol Pietrazek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matta Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matta Jeremy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Truong
Represented By: Mary Carol Pietrazek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Matta
Represented By: Mary Carol Pietrazek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Matta
Represented By: Mary Carol Pietrazek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maira Montelongo
Represented By: Leland Garrett McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?