Guity v. Thompson et al
Petitioner: Zenaida Regina Miguel Guity
Respondent: Rose Thompson and Melissa De Leon
Case Number: 5:2019cv01141
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Melissa De Leon, Rose Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McAndrew, Lacy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Melissa De Leon, Rose Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAndrew, Lacy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Fred Biery. Respondent's responsive pleading is due on or before November 15, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Melissa De Leon, Rose Thompson. (McAndrew, Lacy)
October 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 9, 2019 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt returned as delivered of #3 Order, (mgr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt returned as delivered of #5 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Order, (mgr)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. The Court hereby ORDERS Respondents to file a response to the Petition within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of service. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) Modified on 9/26/2019, to edit text (mgr).
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Zenaida Regina Miguel Guity. (fs)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 500051033), filed by Zenaida Regina Miguel Guity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt Copy)(fs)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fs)
September 20, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (fs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guity v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zenaida Regina Miguel Guity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rose Thompson
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa De Leon
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?