Ramirez v. Thompson et al
Petitioner: Erika Susana Periera Ramirez
Respondent: Rose Thompson and Melissa de Leon
Case Number: 5:2019cv01147
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Respondents Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED and petitioners 28 U.S.C. 2241 Habeas Corpus Petition (ECF No. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Rose Thompson, Melissa de Leon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McAndrew, Lacy)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE BACK TO DISTRICT COURT, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Recd. Certified Acknowledgment card from the AUSA. (wg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Order (mgr)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Erika Susana Periera Ramirez. (dtg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00; receipt number 500051031), filed by Erika Susana Periera Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
September 20, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erika Susana Periera Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rose Thompson
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa de Leon
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?