James W. Myart, Jr. v. City of San Antonio, et al
Plaintiff: James W. Myart, Jr.
Defendant: City of San Antonio, Melissa Cabello Havrda, Jada Andrews-Sullivan, John Courage, County of Bexar, Anna Sandoval, Leticia Vacek, Shirley Gonzales, Ron Nirenberg, Clayton Perry, City Magistrate Michael Ramos, Robert C Trevino, Bexar County Sheriff, Dr. Adrianna Rocha Garcia, Erik Walsh, Manny Pelaez, Briseno, Rebecca J Viagran, City Magistrate Office, J Cantu, Michael Ramos, Rebecca J. Viagran, F/N/U Briseno, J. Cantu and Robert C. Trevino
Case Number: 5:2019cv01174
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by James W. Myart, Jr. (wg)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to James W. Myart, Jr. ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days, show cause why his claims against City Manager Ramos, Bexar County, the Bexar County Sheriff, and Bexar County Deputy Sheriffs Briseno and Cantu should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by James W. Myart, Jr. (rg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James W. Myart, Jr. (rg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for permission to serve defendant Jada Andrews Sullivan by James W. Myart, Jr. (rg)
October 17, 2019 Motion No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION for Recusal. (rg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION for Recusal filed by James W. Myart, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Referral to Judge: David A. Ezra. (rg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss by Jada Andrews-Sullivan, City Magistrate Office, City of San Antonio, John Courage, Adrianna Rocha Garcia, Shirley Gonzales, Melissa Cabello Havrda, Ron Nirenberg, Manny Pelaez, Clayton Perry, Michael Ramos, Anna Sandoval, Robert C. Trevino, Leticia Vacek, Rebecca J. Viagran, Erik Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ralls, Nathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Michael Ramos (Ralls, Nathan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Recusal Chief Judge Garcia by James W. Myart, Jr. (rg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to file electronically by James W. Myart, Jr. (rg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based on Judicial Economy by Bexar County Sheriff, F/N/U Briseno, J. Cantu, County of Bexar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Bexar County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Bowen, Susan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Notice of Consent to Removal by Bexar County Sheriff (Bowen, Susan)
September 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Certificate of Notice by Jada Andrews-Sullivan, City Magistrate Office, City of San Antonio, John Courage, Adrianna Rocha Garcia, Shirley Gonzales, Melissa Cabello Havrda, Ron Nirenberg, Manny Pelaez(Individual), Manny Pelaez(Official), Clayton Perry, Michael Ramos, Michael Ramos, Anna Sandoval, Robert C Trevino, Leticia Vacek, Rebecca J Viagran, Erik Walsh re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Ralls, Nathan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shirley Gonzales, Robert C Trevino, Michael Ramos, Manny Pelaez(Individual), Manny Pelaez(Official), Anna Sandoval, City Magistrate Office, Ron Nirenberg, City of San Antonio, Rebecca J Viagran, Melissa Cabello Havrda, John Courage, Clayton Perry, Jada Andrews-Sullivan, Erik Walsh, Adrianna Rocha Garcia, Michael Ramos, Leticia Vacek (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12667471), filed by Shirley Gonzales, Robert C Trevino, Michael Ramos, Manny Pelaez(Individual), Manny Pelaez(Official), Anna Sandoval, City Magistrate Office, Ron Nirenberg, City of San Antonio, Rebecca J Viagran, Melissa Cabello Havrda, John Courage, Clayton Perry, Jada Andrews-Sullivan, Erik Walsh, Adrianna Rocha Garcia, Michael Ramos, Leticia Vacek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Attachment, #4 Supplement)(Ralls, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James W. Myart, Jr. v. City of San Antonio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Cabello Havrda
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Andrews-Sullivan
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Courage
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Bexar
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Sandoval
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Vacek
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Gonzales
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Nirenberg
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Perry
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Magistrate Michael Ramos
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Trevino
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County Sheriff
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Adrianna Rocha Garcia
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Pelaez
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briseno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca J Viagran
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Magistrate Office
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ramos
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Represented By: Michael Anthony Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca J. Viagran
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/N/U Briseno
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cantu
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Trevino
Represented By: Nathan Mark Ralls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Myart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?