Fritz John Hoeflein, III, et al v. Crescent Drilling and Production, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fritz John Hoeflein, III and Raul Solis, III
Defendant: Crescent Drilling and Production, Inc. and Crescent Drilling Foreman, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01194
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/14/2020, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/5/2019) (rg).
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint . Attorney Mark D. Temple added to party Crescent Drilling Foreman, Inc.(pty:dft) by Crescent Drilling Foreman, Inc., Crescent Drilling and Production, Inc..(Temple, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Raul Solis, III, Fritz John Hoeflein, III.(Josephson, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SEVERING AND STAYING CASE - ORDERED that the District Court SEVER the claims of Plaintiff Langen from the claims of the opt-in Plaintiffs Fritz John Hoeflein, III and Raul Solis, III. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk open a new cause number with respect to the claims of opt-in Plaintiffs Fritz John Hoeflein, III and Raul Solis, III and assign the new cause of action to the Honorable Fred Biery with the associated Magistrate Judge asElizabeth S. (Betsy) Chestney. The District Clerk should file the following documents from this case into the new cause of action: Plaintiffs Complaint [#1], Hoefleins consent to join [#34], Soliss consent to join [#39], and a copy of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hoflein and Solis file an Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order in the new cause of action designating themselves as lead Plaintiffs in the proposed FLSA collective action and removing the claims of Langen. Defendant shall file an Answer to the Amended Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Raul Solis, III. (rg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Fritz John Hoeflein, III. (rg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Raul Solis, III, Fritz John Hoeflein, III.(rg)
October 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
October 4, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritz John Hoeflein, III, et al v. Crescent Drilling and Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fritz John Hoeflein, III
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Solis, III
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Drilling and Production, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Knettel
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Represented By: Peter J. Stuhldreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Drilling Foreman, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?