Myart, Jr. v. Wolff, et al
Plaintiff: James Myart, Jr.
Defendant: Bexar County, Nelson W. Wolff, David Smith, Justin Rodriguez, Javier Salazar, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC and Joe Gonzales
Case Number: 5:2019cv01286
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Deputy Briseno's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief by Javier Salazar. (Bowen, Susan)
December 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (rf)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #5 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Gonzales, Justin Rodriguez, Javier Salazar, David Smith, Nelson W. Wolff Certificate of Service Notice of Correction,,, #12 Response, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Criminal District Attorney's Gonzales' Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief MOTION for Summary Judgment, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Judge and Commissioners' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief MOTION for Summary Judgment (Bowen, Susan)
November 18, 2019 DEFICIECNY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THESE THREE DOCUMENTS ARE DEFICIENT - Certificate of service reflects service of document via CM/ECF. Not all parties to this case are registered to receive electronic notification. Please submit a new certificate of service ONLY as a separate document stating the alternate means of service to James Myart who did not receive service by electronic means. See page 15 of the Admin. Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing.re #12 Response, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Criminal District Attorney's Gonzales' Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief MOTION for Summary Judgment, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Judge and Commissioners' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief MOTION for Summary Judgment. (rf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED***RESPONSE Bexar County Defendants' Response Objecting to 26 Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing by Joe Gonzales, Justin Rodriguez, Javier Salazar, David Smith, Nelson W. Wolff. (Bowen, Susan) Modified on 11/18/2019, to designate deficiency and link to doc #6 (rf).
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 ****DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED*** MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Judge and Commissioners' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief by Nelson W. Wolff. (Bowen, Susan). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/18/2019 (rf). Modified on 11/18/2019, to designate deficiency (rf).
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED*** MOTION to Dismiss Bexar County Criminal District Attorney's Gonzales' Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Brief by Joe Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bowen, Susan). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/18/2019 (rf). Modified on 11/18/2019, to designate deficiency(rf).
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendant's Designation of Lead Counsel for Aramark Correctional Services, LLC by Aramark Correctional Services, LLC (Smith, Sarah)
November 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #7 MOTION for Service of Summons on Certain Defendants. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
November 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
November 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #5 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
November 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Aramark Correctional Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Kimberly R. Jessett added to party Aramark Correctional Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Aramark Correctional Services, LLC.(Jessett, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #7 Motion to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #6 Motion for TRO to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #5 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Out of State Medical Treatment by James Myart, Jr (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Service of Summons on Certain Defendants by James Myart, Jr. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James Myart, Jr. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by James Myart, Jr. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Myart, Jr. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jason K. Pulliam recused. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
October 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bexar County (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12785197), filed by Bexar County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Bowen, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myart, Jr. v. Wolff, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson W. Wolff
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smith
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rodriguez
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Salazar
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Represented By: Sarah R. Smith
Represented By: Kimberly R. Jessett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Gonzales
Represented By: Susan A. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Myart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?