Campos v. U. S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Roxann Campos
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 5:2019cv01292
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, ( Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/9/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(rf)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Ramon S. Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U. S. Bank National Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12792105), filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet A. Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement B. Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C. State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit D. Bexar CAD)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos v. U. S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Brenda Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxann Campos
Represented By: Ramon S. Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?