Jacob Stauffer v. Civil Air Patrol, et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Stauffer
Defendant: William Sydow, Civil Air Patrol, William Blatchley and Paul Creed III
Case Number: 5:2019cv01293
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Civil Air Patrol answer due 1/30/2020. (wg)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is now on or before January 30, 2020. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ar)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Jacob Stauffer. (Morris, J.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Stauffer. Civil Air Patrol served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Morris, J.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to William Blatchley. (rg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Paul Creed III. (rg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William Sydow. (rg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Civil Air Patrol. (rg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jacob Stauffer. (Morris, J.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (rg)
October 31, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12792499). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jacob Stauffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint)(Morris, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob Stauffer v. Civil Air Patrol, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Stauffer
Represented By: J. T. Morris
Represented By: Ramzi Ragheb Khazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sydow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Air Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Creed III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?