McClellan v. Tamaro et al
Plaintiff: Casey McClellan and Caso
Defendant: CASO Document Management, Inc., Lana Tamaro and Richard Tamaro
Case Number: 5:2019cv01328
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Casey McClellan as to Richard Tamaro. Waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Tourtellotte, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Casey McClellan as to Lana Tamaro. Waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Tourtellotte, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Casey McClellan as to CASO Document Management, Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Tourtellotte, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Casey McClellan. (Tourtellotte, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
November 13, 2019 This case has been Randomly Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 500051797 (wg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Casey McClellan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Tamaro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey McClellan
Represented By: Thomas N. Tourtellotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caso
Represented By: Thomas N. Tourtellotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASO Document Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana Tamaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tamaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?