Saavedra v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Biatris Casillas Saavedra
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv01387
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biatris Casillas Saavedra. Andrew Saul served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Olinsky, Howard)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Biatris Casillas Saavedra. (Olinsky, Howard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (wg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Biatris Casillas Saavedra.(wg)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING re #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Biatris Casillas Saavedra, ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint [#1-1] shall be filed by the Clerk without prepayment of fees, costs or the giving of security, and the Clerk shall, until further Order of this Court, waive the collection of any other fees or costs from Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk issue the summons attached to Plaintiffs motion. Counsel is directed to serve each Defendant required to be served with a copy of the summons, complaint, and a copy of this Order by certified mail, returnreceipt requested. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
November 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney.. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Biatris Casillas Saavedra. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk re: Service of Process, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saavedra v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biatris Casillas Saavedra
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?