Thomas v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deanna Thomas
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc. and PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01418
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC. (Clarke, Thomas)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A. Clarke on behalf of PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC. Attorney Thomas A. Clarke added to party PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC(pty:dft) (Clarke, Thomas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna Thomas. PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Thompson, Russell)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES dba GM FINANCIAL'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Sabrina A. Neff added to party General Motors Financial Company, Inc.(pty:dft) by General Motors Financial Company, Inc..(Neff, Sabrina)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna Thomas. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (Thompson, Russell)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC. (wg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Deanna Thomas. (Thompson, Russell)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors Financial Company, Inc., PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC. (wg)
December 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
December 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Deanna Thomas. (Thompson, Russell)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Deanna Thomas. (Thompson, Russell)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12932946), filed by Deanna Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina A. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRG Recovery & Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina A. Neff
Represented By: Thomas A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Thomas
Represented By: Russell S. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?