Ule v. Bexar County Hospital District, et al
Plaintiff: Joe Ule
Defendant: Bexar County Hospital District, Sheriff Javier Salazar and Bexar County
Case Number: 5:2019cv01459
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bexar County, Javier Salazar, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bexar County, Defendant Javier Salazar (Green, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE UHS's Reply to Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss to #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Bexar County Hospital District. (Cavaretta, Laura)
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Joe Ule, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bexar County, Defendant Javier Salazar (Sachanowicz, Leslie) Modified on 2/10/2020 To edit text (bc).
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joe Ule, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Bexar County Hospital District (Sachanowicz, Leslie)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as unopposed. Plaintiff's response to Defendants Bexar County and Sheriff Javier Salazar's Motion to Dismiss [#13] is due on or before February 7, 2020. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ESC)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Bexar County and Sheriff Javier Salazar's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 13) by Joe Ule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Sachanowicz, Leslie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bexar County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal as to the Bexar County Hospital District d/b/a University Health System)(Cavaretta, Laura)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 DEFENDANTS BEXAR COUNTY AND SHERIFF JAVIER SALAZARS MOTION TO DISMISS by Bexar County, Javier Salazar. (bc)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Upon entry of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall file Defendants Bexar County and Sheriff Javier Salazars Motion to Dismiss and the exhibits attached to their motion in accordance with Local Rule CV-7(b). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Bexar County, Javier Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Bexar County and Sheriff Javier Salazar's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Green, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER, PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER AS AN ATTACHMENT AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION*** re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (bc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim subject to docket no. 9 by Bexar County, Javier Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Green, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER AS AN ATTACHMENT AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION*** Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Bexar County, Javier Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Bexar County and Sheriff Javier Salazar's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Green, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2020 To edit text (bc).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rf)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Javier Salazar. (bc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bexar County Hospital District. (bc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bexar County. (bc)
December 17, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
December 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12975447). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Joe Ule. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sachanowicz, Leslie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Ule. Request for Issuance of Summons to Sheriff Javier Salazar (Sachanowicz, Leslie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Ule. Request for Issuance of Summons to Bexar County Hospital District d/b/a University Health System (Sachanowicz, Leslie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Ule. Request for Summons as to Bexar County (Sachanowicz, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ule v. Bexar County Hospital District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County Hospital District
Represented By: Laura Anne Cavaretta
Represented By: Gabrielle N. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Javier Salazar
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ule
Represented By: Leslie J.A. Sachanowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?