Signature Financial LLC v. McClung et al

Plaintiff: Signature Financial LLC
Petitioner: Kimberly McClung
3Rd Party Defendant: JMOS Acquisition, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: John McClung
Case Number: 5:2019mc00509
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #8 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Quash With Respect to Great Central Mortgage Acceptance Co., LTD. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #8 Motion to Withdraw to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Quash With Respect to Great Central Mortgage Acceptance Co., LTD by John McClung, Kimberly McClung. (Money, Eric)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Resetting Motion Hearing for #1 MOTION to Quash ( Motion Hearing reset for 7/23/2019 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Signature Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hofsdal, Marie) Modified on 6/14/2019 (aej).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
May 24, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Barrows for Marie Polito Hofsdal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12150053). Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Barrows for Marie Polito Hofsdal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12150053) by on behalf of Signature Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Signature Financial LLC, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Respondent John McClung, Movant Kimberly McClung (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Barrows, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Hearing on #1 MOTION to Quash : Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2019 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
May 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Quash, #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric C. Money ( Filing fee $ 100.00 receipt number 500049270). Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Chestney entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Chestney entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric C. Money (Filing fee $100.00 receipt number 500049270) by on behalf of John McClung, Kimberly McClung. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Non-Party Kimberly McClung And Defendant John McClung's MOTION To Quash The Subpoenas Issued By Plaintiff Signature Financial, LLC, To Leslie And Bernadine Ploeger, And Great Central Mortgage Acceptance Co.,Ltd., Requesting The Production Of Documents by John McClung, Kimberly McClung. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt #500042969 for $47.00, #5 Copy of Cover Letter)(dtg) Modified TEXT on 5/15/2019 (dtg).
May 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg)
May 13, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signature Financial LLC v. McClung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signature Financial LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Niborski
Represented By: Marie Polito Hofsdal
Represented By: Robert L. Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JMOS Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Arvin Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John McClung
Represented By: Eric C. Money
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kimberly McClung
Represented By: Eric C. Money
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?