Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
In Re: Lexington Insurance Company Subpoenas
Case Number: 5:2019mc00758
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District of Texas District, Corpus Christi Division as case number 2:19-MC-891. (wg)
July 10, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Quash (rf)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SDTX/CORPUS CHRISTI DIVISION, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Status of Underlying Subpoenas and Consent to Transfer by Lexington Insurance Company (Gregory, Raymond)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond L. Gregory on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Gregory, Raymond)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn Snapka ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12300242) by on behalf of Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snapka, Kathryn)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order HELD IN ABEYANCE #1 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The Court notes the following: (1) the persons subject to the subpoenas have consented to the transfer of this matter to the Court that issued the subpoenas, which is the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Corpus Christi Division; (2) issues raised by the motion to quash appear to have already been raised before the issuing court; and (3) the deadline for production expired before this matter was referred for disposition by a magistrate judge. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT before 2pm on July 3, 2019, the parties shall provide an update to the Court on the status of the underlying subpoenas and show cause why this matter (to the extent it still presents a live controversy) should not be transferred to the issuing Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f); see also Epistar Corp. v. Lowes Cos., Inc., No. 3:17-mc-107-D-BN, 2017 WL 6729547, at *3 (N.D. Tex. Dec. 29, 2017) (noting that where person subject to the subpoena consents to transfer, the Court need not find extraordinary circumstances to transfer the action); Orix USA Corp. v. Armentrout, No. 3:16-mc-63-N-BN, 2016 WL 3926507, at *2 (N.D. Tex. Jul. 21, 2016) (Rule 45(f) does not require that a motion to transfer be filed, and the Court may sua sponte order transfer where appropriate.). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
July 1, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Quash. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Quash to Magistrate Judge Farrer. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc.'s MOTION for Protection or to Modify and/or Quash Concerning Subpoenas Issued by Lexington Insurance Company for Michael Mansueto and Michael Smiley by Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
June 27, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)
June 27, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandpiper Condominium Council of Owners, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Represented By: William J. Chriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Lexington Insurance Company Subpoenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?