United States of America v. Burns
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: James Mark Burns
Case Number: 5:2019mc01006
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bass, Steven)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Bass, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 10/16/2019 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 cover letter, #4 envelope)(mgr)
August 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Steven B. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Mark Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?