Ouedraogo v. Huron et al
Petitioner: Nestor Ouedraogo
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Andrew Huron, Matthew T. Albence and Daniel Bible
Case Number: 5:2020cv00016
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Matthew T. Albence, Daniel Bible, Andrew Huron, Thomas S. Wimkowski, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowry, Faith)
February 3, 2020 Mailed an IFP Application to Petitioner. (mgr)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY ORDER Petitioner, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, must submit either the filing fee of $5.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperistogether with a copy of the petitioners trust fund statement.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as delivered of #4 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt returned as delivered of #4 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order (mgr)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nestor Ouedraogo. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Nestor Ouedraogo. (nm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nestor Ouedraogo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
January 6, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (nm)
January 6, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON PULLIAM. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouedraogo v. Huron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas S. Wimkowski
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Huron
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nestor Ouedraogo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?