Duarte v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Rudy Duarte
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00045
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (bc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss (docket no. 4) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The case is closed. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER as to Rudy Duarte. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, within seven (7) days of this order, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE as to why Defendant's Motion should not be granted as unopposed and/or on the merits. Plaintiff's response to this Order must address both the merits of Defendant's Motion and provide good cause for the delayed response. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 APPENDIX to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Foster, Benjamin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Foster, Benjamin)
January 14, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
January 14, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Foster, Benjamin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Foster, Benjamin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13075740), filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet and State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - Bexar County Appraisal District's valuation for the Property)(Foster, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?