Nathan v. Arcus Hunting, LLC
Plaintiff: Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr.
Defendant: Arcus Hunting, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00392
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr of Service of Amended Complaint and Summons upon Texas Secretary of State (Cox, Juliet)
May 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Arcus Hunting, LLC answer due 6/15/2020. (mgr)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Arcus Hunting, LLC. (mgr)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr. (Johnson, Tera)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:PLEASE RE-SUBMIT SUMMONS THE LAST PARAGRAPH IS MISSING AS WELL AS THESIGNATURE LINE re #7 Request for Issuance of Summons (mgr)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -SUMMONS LAST PARAGRAPH AND SIGNATURE LINE***REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr. (Johnson, Tera) Modified on 4/8/2020 (mgr).
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr amending, filed by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr.(Johnson, Tera)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arcus Hunting, LLC. (mgr)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to file an amended Complaint that adequately alleges thecitizenship of the parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity, no later than April 10, 2020.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tera D. Johnson Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Juliet A. Cox ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13400496) by on behalf of Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Johnson, Tera) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/30/2020) (mgr). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/30/2020) (mgr).
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr. (Johnson, Tera)
March 26, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
March 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13393666), filed by Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Johnson, Tera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan v. Arcus Hunting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcus Hunting, LLC
Represented By: Constantine Z. Pamphilis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey P. Nathan, Jr.
Represented By: Tera D. Johnson
Represented By: Juliet A. Cox
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?