Cuc Cun v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Reginaldo Cuc Cun
Respondent: Daniel Bible, William Barr, Reynaldo Castro and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00399
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by William Barr, Daniel Bible, Reynaldo Castro, Reginaldo Cuc Cun, Chad Wolf. (Lowry, Faith)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William Barr, Daniel Bible, Reynaldo Castro, Chad Wolf amending #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus., filed by Reginaldo Cuc Cun.(Yang, Edna)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt of Petitioner's Section 2254 complaint as to Reynaldo Castro. (wg)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order, (wg)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVIVCE AND ANSWER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Reginaldo Cuc Cun. Copy of the Petition & Order shall be forwarded Via Certified Mail to the attn: of Barr, Wolf, and Bible, Service on Respondents Reynaldo Castro, Warden of the South Texas Detention Complex, Via Certified Mail. Respondents shall file an answer or response to the Petition within (30) Thirty Days from the date of Service. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 500053630), filed by Reginaldo Cuc Cun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt, #3 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
March 27, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (nm)
March 27, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuc Cun v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: John F. Paniszczyn
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reynaldo Castro
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginaldo Cuc Cun
Represented By: Edna Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?