Villereal v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Marissa Villereal
Defendant: Andrew Stephen Russell and Diamond Holdings, Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00609
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Macias, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS ( Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez) The conference will take place via videoconference at a link to be provided by theCourtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 8/9/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. ADR Report Deadline due by 12/31/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2020, and Discovery due by 4/30/2021). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Macias, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Scheduling Recommendations)(Macias, Mark)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/30/2020,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge within (30) Days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Service of Citation-POP, #3 Exhibit Service of Citation-Affidavits, #4 Exhibit Defts' Original Answer, #5 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit CO Sec of State-Diamond Holdings, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Macias, Mark)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. Show Cause Response due by 6/4/2020, Defendants are ordered to file an amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship ofthe parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
May 22, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (cd)
May 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Macias, Mark)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13595234), filed by Diamond Holdings, Ltd., Andrew Stephen Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Macias, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villereal v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Stephen Russell
Represented By: Mark E. Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark E. Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Villereal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?