Lujan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bobby Chavez Lujan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Liaison
Case Number: 5:2020cv00752
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Chavez Lujan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Olinsky, Howard)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bobby Chavez Lujan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mgr)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Bobby Chavez Lujan.(bc)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if not already accomplished, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff Lujan shall submit to the Clerks Office a fully completed United States Marshal Service Form 285. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
June 25, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer.. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
June 25, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Chavez Lujan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lujan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Liaison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Chavez Lujan
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?