Garcia v. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: Micheal Garcia, Diego Alejandro Diaz, Edwin Johnson, Sharnay Knight, Arnetta Nelson, Javier Cabrera, Hannah Dunn, Lindannette Curtis, Meghan Sallee, Heather Carter, Khiara Carter, Virginia Navarro, Antonio Monjarez, Joseph Melugin, Jr., Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden, Anne Villarreal, Miguel De Alba, Alexis Carter, Valerie Trinidad, Jazmin Phelps, Denise Finck, Kayla Hightower, Shahraz Mahmood, Brian J. Spacil, Elleri Martinez and Edricka Jimerson
Defendant: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Petitioner: Kortni Hoover
Case Number: 5:2020cv00766
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Micheal Garcia. (Alexander, William)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Lincoln O. Bisbee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Anne Villarreal)(Alexander, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Cullen Wallace filed on behalf of Lincoln O. Bisbee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13824689) by on behalf of MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Wallace, Thomas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Wallace, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Ian A. Wright regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Thomas Cullen Wallace added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft) by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Wallace, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kortni Hoover)(Alexander, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Javier Cabrera, #2 Exhibit Consent of Edricka Jimerson, #3 Exhibit Consent of Antonio Monjarez, #4 Exhibit Consent of Arnetta Nelson)(Alexander, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Miguel De Alba)(Alexander, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Brian J. Spacil)(Alexander, William)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheal Garcia. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Alexander, William)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Khiara Carter)(Alexander, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Hannah Dunn)(Alexander, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Virginia Navarro)(Alexander, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (cd)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Join by Micheal Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden, #2 Exhibit Consent of Alexis Carter, #3 Exhibit Consent of Heather Carter, #4 Exhibit Consent of Lindannette Curtis, #5 Exhibit Consent of Diego Alejandro Diaz, #6 Exhibit Consent of Denise Finck, #7 Exhibit Consent of Kayla Hightower, #8 Exhibit Consent of Edwin Johnson, #9 Exhibit Consent of Sharnay Knight, #10 Exhibit Consent of Shahraz Mahmoud, #11 Exhibit Consent of Elleri Martinez, #12 Exhibit Consent o Joseph Melugin, Jr, #13 Exhibit Consent of Jazmin Phelps, #14 Exhibit Consent of Meghan Sallee, #15 Exhibit Consent of Valerie Trinidad)(Alexander, William)
July 1, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (cd)
July 1, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Micheal Garcia. (Alexander, William)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13717486), filed by Micheal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Micheal Garcia Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Lincoln O. Bisbee
Represented By: Thomas Cullen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Garcia
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Alejandro Diaz
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Johnson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharnay Knight
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnetta Nelson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Cabrera
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Dunn
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindannette Curtis
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Sallee
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Carter
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khiara Carter
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Navarro
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Monjarez
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Melugin, Jr.
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie B. Aistrope-Golden
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Villarreal
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel De Alba
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Carter
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Trinidad
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmin Phelps
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Finck
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Hightower
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahraz Mahmood
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Spacil
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elleri Martinez
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edricka Jimerson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kortni Hoover
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?